what should i use to solve this question? Thank You
in Other Math Topics by Level 1 User (120 points)

Your answer

Your name to display (optional):
Privacy: Your email address will only be used for sending these notifications.
Anti-spam verification:
To avoid this verification in future, please log in or register.

1 Answer

Best answer

On the day Sara was born 500 was invested and it gained 6.4% interest=6.4% of 500=5*6.4=32 by the time she was one year old. After 25 years that will have multiplied by 25=25*32=800. When Sara was 1 another 500 was invested and after 24 years this would gain 24*32=768. When she was 2 there would be 23 years left and 23*32=736 would accumulate. So we have a progression 800+768+736+... This can be written 32(25+24+23+...1). The sum of the numbers between 1 and 25 is given by 25*26/2=13*25=325. (If you look at the series and take the first and last terms they add up to 26; then the sum of 24 and 2, 23 and 3, all add up to 26. In the middle we have 12+14 and 13 on its own, so we have 12 pairs of number adding up to 26=312 plus 13=325.) Multiply by 32: 32*325=10400. But her parents invested 500 a year for 25 years so we need to add 25*500 to this interest=10400+12500=22,900.

by Top Rated User (716k points)
selected by
thank you

Related questions

Welcome to MathHomeworkAnswers.org, where students, teachers and math enthusiasts can ask and answer any math question. Get help and answers to any math problem including algebra, trigonometry, geometry, calculus, trigonometry, fractions, solving expression, simplifying expressions and more. Get answers to math questions. Help is always 100% free!
84,486 questions
89,388 answers
1,997 comments
8,008 users